CA SB417 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 252, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 252, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26835 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: licensed dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB417 Blakespear et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Assembly - SB 417 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB417 Blakespear (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Assembly - SB 417 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB417 Blakespear (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 252, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2418.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 2678.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1049.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 803.) (April 18). |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 26835 | Amended Code | Citation Text |