CA SB416 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2053.1 of the Penal Code, relating to corrections.
Title
Corrections: educational programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB416 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 416 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Bryan (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB416 Hueso et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 416 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Bryan (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB416 Hueso et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2376.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2715.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HIGHER ED. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 793.) (April 14). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 592.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and ED. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2053.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |