CA SB416 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-13 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-13 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3212, 3212.1, 3212.2, 3212.5, 3212.6, 3212.85, 3212.9, and 3213.2 of the Labor Code, relating to worker’s compensation.
Title
Employment: workers’ compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 416 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Gipson (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB416 Hueso (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB416 Hueso (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3318.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1202.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1098.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 467.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3213.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |