CA SB414 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 38561.9 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climate change: applications using hydrogen: assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB414 Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2023-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2023-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1266.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1169.) (May 18).
2023-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2023-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 936.) (April 26).
2023-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2023-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2023-03-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2023-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 573.) (March 29).
2023-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q.
2023-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2023-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code38561.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback