CA SB412 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3043 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Parole hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 412 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Ramos (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB412 Archuleta (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB412 Archuleta (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-18 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3249.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-07-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-03 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 426.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3043 | Amended Code | Citation Text |