CA SB409 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1012.5 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans’ homes: services: complex mental and behavioral health needs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB409 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on V.A.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1356.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 540.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on V.A.
2017-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code1012.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback