CA SB407 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1358.91 and 1358.11 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10192.91 and 10192.11 of the Insurance Code, relating to Medicare.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicare supplement benefit coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB407 Monning (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-07-02AssemblyJuly 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1185.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1098.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 848.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback