CA SB406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 392, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 392, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21655.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: high-occupancy vehicle lanes: exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB406 Leyva Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 406 Leyva Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB406 Leyva (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 406 Leyva Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB406 Leyva (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 392, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2465.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2837.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 1352.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1184.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 857.) (April 25). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21655.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21655.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5205.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5205.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |