CA SB403 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 51 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 200 and 210.2 of, and to add Section 210.4 to, the Education Code, and to amend Sections 11135, 12920, 12921, 12926, 12930, 12931, 12940, 12944, 12955, 12955.8, 12956.1, 12956.2, and 12993 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination on the basis of caste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB403 Wahab et al (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2023-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 893.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2023-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2023-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code51Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code200Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code210.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code210.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code11135Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12920Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12921Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12926Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12930Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12931Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12940Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12944Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12955Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12955.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12956.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12956.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12993Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback