CA SB399 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1374.73 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10144.51 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: pervasive developmental disorder or autism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB399 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 399 Portantino Senate Third Reading By NAZARIAN (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB399 Portantino (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-29 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 5874.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 6588.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 12).
2018-04-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4112.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-22SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4055.) (January 18).
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-12SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4020.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 10.
2017-04-26SenateApril 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 625.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-03-14SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
2017-03-14SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
2017-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1374.73Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10144.51Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback