CA SB398 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 548, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4900, 4902, and 4903 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection and advocacy agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB398 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 398 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB398 Durazo et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 548, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2786.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3170.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-30AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-07-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-07-05AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
2019-07-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-07-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
2019-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2019-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback