CA SB395 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 489, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 127885 of, and to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 130075) to Part 7 of Division 107 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Part 13.6 (commencing with Section 31000) to Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to the Healthy Outcomes and Prevention Education Act, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excise tax: electronic cigarettes: Health Careers Opportunity Grant Program: Small and Rural Hospital Relief Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB395 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 395 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB395 Caballero et al (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 489, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-02SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2358.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-01SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 2624.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (July 13).
2021-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and HEALTH.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1335.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1190.) (May 20).
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 955.) (April 28).
2021-04-15SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2021-04-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 8).
2021-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code127885Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code130075New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code31000New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395#93ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395#92CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB395

Bill Comments

feedback