CA SB395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 869, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2000.5 of, to add Sections 1023 and 2000.3 to, and to add and repeal Section 2000.6 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to wild game mammals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wild game mammals: accidental taking and possession of wildlife: collision with a vehicle: wildlife salvage permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB395 Archuleta et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 395 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB395 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 869, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-13 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-12SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2890.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 5. Page 3435.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1098.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 622.) (April 9).
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code1023New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code2000.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code2000.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2000.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback