CA SB394 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 765, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 878 of, and to repeal Section 872 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: Moore Universal Telephone Service Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 394 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB394 Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 765, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-01SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-07-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on C. & C.
2021-04-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-04-05SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 658.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-03-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-03-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-03-17SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-03-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 499.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 15.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code872Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code878Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback