CA SB391 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 276, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 276, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4090 of, and to add Article 11 (commencing with Section 5450) to Chapter 6 of Part 5 of Division 4 of, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Common interest developments: emergency powers and procedures.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB391 Min et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - SB 391 Min Third Reading Urgency By Davies (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB391 Min Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - SB 391 Min Third Reading Urgency By Davies (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB391 Min Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 276, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2037.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2309.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 970.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 686.) (April 6). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 553.) (March 18). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4090 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5450 | New Code | See Bill Text |