CA SB390 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 339 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Development Department: recession plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB390 Laird et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 390 Laird Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB390 Laird et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-02SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2354.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-01SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2605.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-07-07AssemblyJuly 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2021-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1282.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-29SenateMay 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 843.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-03-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-03-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code339New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB390
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB390#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB390#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB390#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB390#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB390#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB390#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB390#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB390

Bill Comments

feedback