CA SB390 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 52060 and 52066 of the Education Code, relating to library standards.
Title
Local control and accountability plans: annual goals: state priorities: model school library standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB390 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 390 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB390 Mendoza (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 390 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB390 Mendoza (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-14 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-14 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 6. Page 2842.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 3216.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1183.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 782.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1770 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52066 | Amended Code | Citation Text |