CA SB389 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 182.1 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation: transportation project delivery services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB389 Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-06-26AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-21AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1247.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenatePublished May 16 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1080.) (May 15).
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-05-01SenateMay 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code182.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code90Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback