CA SB388 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1798.138 to the Civil Code, relating to platform companies.
Title
Platform companies: content management: negative externalities: report: acceptable use policy: illegal content.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | April 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | March 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | March 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.138 | New Code | See Bill Text |