CA SB386 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on September 13 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5008.9 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state beaches and parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State beaches and parks: smoking ban.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB386 Glazer et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 386 Glazer Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB386 Glazer et al (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-13SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-09-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 27).
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 1269.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5008.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback