CA SB386 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 66406.8 of the Education Code, relating to college textbooks.
Title
Postsecondary education: textbooks.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. George Runner [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 726.) | |
2009-04-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-01 | Set for hearing April 29. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |