CA SB385 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3502.4 of, and to add Section 3527.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physician Assistant Practice Act: abortion by aspiration: training.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-24 - Assembly - SB 385 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Stephanie Nguyen (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB385 Atkins (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB385 Atkins (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2023-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 2798.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16). |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1023.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 799.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 3. Page 636.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 3502.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3527.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |