CA SB383 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 654.3, 790, and 791 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: informal supervision: deferred entry of judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 383 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Stone (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB383 Cortese Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB383 Cortese (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB383 Cortese Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB383 Cortese (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2636.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 3135.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 30). |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1253.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | March 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Set for hearing March 16. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 654.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 790 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 791 | Amended Code | Citation Text |