CA SB381 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54237 and 54237.7 of, and to add Section 54239.4 to, the Government Code, relating to local government, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Surplus residential property: priorities, procedures, price, and fund: City of South Pasadena.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 381 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By RUBIO (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB381 Portantino Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB381 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB381 Portantino Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB381 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2643.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 3158.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 10). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(e) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 2850.) |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1350.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 942.) (April 27). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54237 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54237.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54239.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |