CA SB381 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Set for hearing March 27.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 @ 9:30 am in Room 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to validate the organization, boundaries, acts, proceedings, and bonds of public bodies, and to provide limitations of time in which actions may be commenced.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Validations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback