CA SB38 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6018.10 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: consumer designation: all volunteer fire department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB38 Hill et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-01-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3130.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-01-16SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2020-01-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3099.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-01-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2020-01-08SenateSet for hearing January 15 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
2020-01-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-06SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-01-06SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-01-06SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-05-23SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Hill.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1088.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 490.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6018.10Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback