CA SB38 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 16 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 69104 of the Government Code, relating to courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts: judgeships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB38 Roth et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4113.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-23SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4055.) (January 18).
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-11SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2017-03-16SenateMarch 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code69104Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback