CA SB378 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 23059 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages: licenses: emergency orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB378 Portantino (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2017-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1134.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 852.) (April 25).
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-13SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-20Senate(Corrected March 21).
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23059New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback