CA SB378 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: base year value transfers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | January 21 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-01-16 | Senate | Set for hearing January 19. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2895.) (January 13). |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 13. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 69.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |