CA SB377 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26950 and 32000 of, and to add Sections 32001 and 32002 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB377 Skinner (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB377 Skinner (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 1390.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1168.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 579.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 26950 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 32002 | New Code | See Bill Text |