CA SB374 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6320 of the Family Code, relating to protective orders.
Title
Protective orders: reproductive coercion.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] |
Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-12 - Assembly - SB 374 Min Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB374 Min et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB374 Min et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-07-12 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 2312.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 591.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |