CA SB373 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Hearing: Jun 20 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Hearing: Jun 20 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27 of, and to add Sections 2937 and 4990.11 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Board of Behavioral Sciences, Board of Psychology, and Medical Board of California: licensees’ and registrants’ addresses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB373 Menjivar (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1023.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 799.) (April 18). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 636.) (April 10). |
2023-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2937 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4990.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |