CA SB373 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31484.9 of the Government Code, relating to county employees' retirement.
Title
Retirement: Contra Costa County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB373 DeSaulnier (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - SB 373 DeSaulnier Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB373 DeSaulnier (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - SB 373 DeSaulnier Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB373 DeSaulnier (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2011-06-27 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1571.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-06-16 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-06-15 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1959.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2011-06-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 711.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-04-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 11). | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31484.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |