CA SB371 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22454, 22454.5, and 25257 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schoolbuses: stop requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateDied on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2020-01-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-27SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-01-27SenateRead third time and amended.
2020-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-01-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-14SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2019-05-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2019-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30).
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 656.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS., ED., and JUD.
2019-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code22454Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code22454.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code25257Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback