CA SB37 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23151 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Corporation taxes: tax rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3099.) (January 15). |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |