CA SB368 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11106, 11108.2, 25555, 26379, 26405, 26577, 29805, and 32110 of, and to add Sections 26892 and 26894 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: requirements for licensed dealers.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Catherine Blakespear [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Steve Padilla [D] |
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB368 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 368 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB368 Portantino et al (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 368 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB368 Portantino et al (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-18 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2674.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3156.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3010.) |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1253.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1167.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 579.) (March 28). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11108.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26379 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26577 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26892 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26894 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |