CA SB368 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.0061 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10112.291 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: deductibles and out-of-pocket expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB368 Limón Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 368 Limón Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB368 Limón (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 368 Limón Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB368 Limón (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2517.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 2689.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 6). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1331.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 533.) (March 17). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.0061 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.291 | New Code | See Bill Text |