CA SB364 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 49557 of the Education Code, and to add Section 10618.7 to, and to add Chapter 10.2 (commencing with Section 18936) to Part 6 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to pupil meals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil meals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB364 Skinner et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-08-11AssemblyAugust 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2022-08-03AssemblyAugust 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2022-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-06-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2022-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2022-05-05AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HUM. S.
2022-01-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2022-01-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2822.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2022-01-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2022-01-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2794.) (January 20).
2022-01-18SenateSet for hearing January 20.
2022-01-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-16SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-04-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-04-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 702.) (April 7).
2021-03-24SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2021-03-18SenateReferral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on ED., HUMAN S., and JUD.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49557Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10618.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364#92AMD
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB364

Bill Comments

feedback