CA SB364 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 73 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 105 and 106 of, and to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 83) to Part 0.5 of Division 1 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Change in ownership: nonresidential active solar energy systems: initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB364 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - SB 364 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB364 Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - SB 364 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB364 Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 4286.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 12. Page 5059.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 27). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | June 17 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and V.A. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1268.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1097.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 465.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and V.A. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |