CA SB362 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 4113.7 and 4317 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Chain community pharmacies: quotas.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB362 Newman Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 362 Newman Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB362 Newman (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 362 Newman Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB362 Newman (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2279.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2568.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1337.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 573.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4113.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4317 | New Code | See Bill Text |