CA SB361 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-18 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Daly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-18 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Daly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 54230.7 of the Government Code, relating to surplus land.
Title
Surplus land: City of Anaheim.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB361 Umberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB361 Umberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Daly. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 15). |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | July 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 970.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 686.) (April 6). |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54230.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |