CA SB360 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1785.28.6 of the Civil Code, relating to escrow agent rating services.
Title
Consumer Credit Reporting Agencies Act: escrow agent rating services and escrow agents.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-05 - Assembly - SB 360 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB360 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB360 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2228.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2124.) |
2021-06-25 | Assembly | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1344.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1189.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 591.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 456.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I., JUD., and APPR. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1785.28.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |