CA SB360 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19100 of, to amend the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 19200) of Chapter 3 of Division 19 of, to amend the headings of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 19200) and Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 19260) of Division 19 of, to amend the heading of Division 19 (commencing with Section 19001) of, to amend and renumber Sections 19103, 19200.5, 19202, 19203, 19204, 19207, 19209, 19210, 19211, 19212, 19212.5, 19213, 19214, 19214.5, 19215, 19216, 19217, 19220, 19221, 19222, 19223, 19225, 19226, 19227, 19227.5, 19228, 19229, 19229.5, 19230, 19231, 19232, 19233, 19234, 19234.5, 19235, 19236, 19237, 19238, 19239, 19240, 19241, 19242, 19243, 19244, 19245, 19250, 19251, 19252, 19253, 19254, 19255, 19260, 19261, 19262, 19263, 19264, 19267, 19269, 19270, 19271, 19272, 19273, 19274, and 19275 of, to amend and renumber the headings of Article 2 (commencing with Section 19220), Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 19225), Article 3 (commencing with Section 19230), and Article 4 (commencing with Section 19250) of Chapter 3 of Division 19 of, to amend, renumber, and add Sections 19101, 19102, and 19201 of, to add Sections 19006, 19282, 19283, and 19286 to, to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 19220) to Chapter 3 of Division 19 of, to repeal Sections 19205, 19208, 19265, 19266, and 19268 of, and to repeal and add Section 19206 of, the Elections Code, relating to voting systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certification of voting systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB360 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-04 - Assembly - SB 360 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB360 Padilla (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2013-09-06SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2166.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-09-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-09-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 2866.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-08-30AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 2794.) Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-26AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 2701.) Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21).
2013-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2013-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2013-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13).
2013-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2013-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 749.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2013-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2013-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2013-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_360&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130410_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130520_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130617_amended_asm_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130617_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130220_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130410_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130520_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130617_amended_asm_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130806_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130826_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130830_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20130909_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_bill_20131005_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_vote_20130430_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_vote_20130513_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_vote_20130524_0938AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_vote_20130813_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_vote_20130821_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_vote_20130904_1214PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_360_vote_20130906_1121AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback