CA SB36 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 1320.35) to Title 10 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to pretrial release.
Title
Pretrial release: risk assessment tools.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] |
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB36 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 36 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB36 Hertzberg et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 36 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB36 Hertzberg et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2865.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3250.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 817.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 439.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1320.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |