CA SB359 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 508, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 508, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 51224.7 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
California Mathematics Placement Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB359 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 359 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB359 Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 359 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB359 Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 508, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2504.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2852.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | July 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1325.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1152.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 647.) (April 15). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51224.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |