CA SB358 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 84602.3 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: Secretary of State: online filing and disclosure system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 358 Stern Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB358 Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-31SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2853.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-04-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-06SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 643.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 428.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-08SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code84602.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback