CA SB357 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11292 and 11293 of, and to repeal Sections 11206 and 11294 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Private railroad car tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 618.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11206 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11292 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11293 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11294 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |