CA SB356 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25402.10 of, and to add Section 25402.14 to, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 8380 of, and to add Section 769.6 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy data transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB356 Skinner (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (July 5).
2017-06-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-11SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 806.) (April 24).
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-06SenateApril 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25402.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25402.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code25402.14New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code323.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code769.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code8380Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback