CA SB355 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 987.8 and 987.81 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reimbursement for court-appointed counsel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Assembly - SB 355 Mitchell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB355 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-06-26SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2017-06-19SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-06-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2259.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 583.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-03-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28).
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code987.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987.81Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback