CA SB352 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 58 and 392 of, and to add Section 475 to, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the military.
Title
The military: sexual harassment.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Tasha Horvath [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 352 Eggman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB352 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB352 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2523.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and JUD. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 887.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 6). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 534.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and JUD. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 392 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 475 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |